Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Re-Referred to HTH/HRE, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to HTH, WAM . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |