Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from HTH/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2682) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to HTH/WTL, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |