House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|