Senate | 02/17/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2452) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to GVO, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |