Senate | 02/17/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported from JDC/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to JDC/GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |