House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 070, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 070, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 211-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 211-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Todd, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Misalucha, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 11:15AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 926).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Conferees Added: Senator Fevella added as Conferee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 11:15AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Misalucha Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Todd Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1831-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-16-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 299) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2791) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|