12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. |