Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2716 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2716 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE MINIMUM WAGE. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2716
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 2716
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO THE MINIMUM WAGE.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows: "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than: (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003; (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006; (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007; (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015; (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016; (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018. (b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than: (1) 25 cents; (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016, below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage. (c) On September 30, 2022, and on September 30 of each third year thereafter, the department shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate. The adjusted minimum wage rate shall be calculated to the nearest five cents using the Honolulu region consumer price index for urban wage earners and clerical workers (CPI-W) or a successor index, for the thirty-six months prior to September 1 of each three year period as calculated by the United States Department of Labor; provided that if in any three year period the adjustment based on the Honolulu region CPI-W would result in a lower minimum wage rate, the minimum wage rate shall not be decreased and the adjusted minimum wage rate shall remain at the most recently established minimum wage rate. Each adjusted minimum wage rate calculated under this subsection shall take effect on the following January 1." SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Section 387-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended to read as follows:
5050
5151 "§387-2 Minimum wages. (a) Except as provided in section 387‑9 and this section, every employer shall pay to each employee employed by the employer, wages at the rate of not less than:
5252
5353 (1) $6.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2003;
5454
5555 (2) $6.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2006;
5656
5757 (3) $7.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2007;
5858
5959 (4) $7.75 per hour beginning January 1, 2015;
6060
6161 (5) $8.50 per hour beginning January 1, 2016;
6262
6363 (6) $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2017; and
6464
6565 (7) $10.10 per hour beginning January 1, 2018.
6666
6767 (b) The hourly wage of a tipped employee may be deemed to be increased on account of tips if the employee is paid not less than:
6868
6969 (1) 25 cents;
7070
7171 (2) 50 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2015; and
7272
7373 (3) 75 cents per hour beginning January 1, 2016,
7474
7575 below the applicable minimum wage by the employee's employer and the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least 50 cents more than the applicable minimum wage; provided that beginning January 1, 2015, the combined amount the employee receives from the employee's employer and in tips is at least $7.00 more than the applicable minimum wage.
7676
7777 (c) On September 30, 2022, and on September 30 of each third year thereafter, the department shall calculate an adjusted minimum wage rate. The adjusted minimum wage rate shall be calculated to the nearest five cents using the Honolulu region consumer price index for urban wage earners and clerical workers (CPI-W) or a successor index, for the thirty-six months prior to September 1 of each three year period as calculated by the United States Department of Labor; provided that if in any three year period the adjustment based on the Honolulu region CPI-W would result in a lower minimum wage rate, the minimum wage rate shall not be decreased and the adjusted minimum wage rate shall remain at the most recently established minimum wage rate. Each adjusted minimum wage rate calculated under this subsection shall take effect on the following January 1."
7878
7979 SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored.
8080
8181 SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval.
8282
8383
8484
8585 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
8686
8787 INTRODUCED BY:
8888
8989 _____________________________
9090
9191
9292
9393
9494
9595 Report Title: Minimum Wage; Consumer Price Index Description: Provides periodic adjustments to the minimum wage using the Honolulu Region Consumer Price Index. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
9696
9797
9898
9999
100100
101101 Report Title:
102102
103103 Minimum Wage; Consumer Price Index
104104
105105
106106
107107 Description:
108108
109109 Provides periodic adjustments to the minimum wage using the Honolulu Region Consumer Price Index.
110110
111111
112112
113113
114114
115115
116116
117117 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.