Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022