House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3067) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2650) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|