Senate | 02/17/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |