House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1279-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 03-18-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 311) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3069) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HTH, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|