House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 77) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2816) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2689) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-17-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:30PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to TRS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|