Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Act 013, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Act 013, on 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 522).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Perruso, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ganaden, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Costales, Holt, D. Kobayashi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1839-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-29-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 79).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2838) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2171) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:10PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|