|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 2:30PM; CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 2:30PM; CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Ihara.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 507).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1854) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 84).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-05-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-04-21 3:05PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to HMS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|