House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 654).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1952-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1197-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Quinlan, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 03-18-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 341) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2861) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|