|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Re-Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Re-Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to HTH, WAM/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|