Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 2:08PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 2:10PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 1:34PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Moriwaki, Kanuha, Inouye Co-Chairs; Rhoads, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 666).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1975-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, B. Kobayashi, Perruso, Wildberger; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Rhoads, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from WAM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM/WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|