House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 387) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from GVO/JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2735) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO/JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Re-Referred to GVO/JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2307) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO will hold a public decision making on 02-11-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|