Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 3:10PM; CR 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:15PM; CR 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marten, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1337) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-16-21 at 2:00 PM in room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 10
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 4) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-08-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|