Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2661) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Wakai. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |