Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|