House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 137, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1238).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 137, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1238).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) DeCoite). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 5:00PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 8:30AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 6:00PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 5:15PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Johanson Co-Chairs; Perruso, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 671).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1905-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Hashem, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-18-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 397) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2846) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|