Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Act 012, 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Act 012, on 04/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1888-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1419-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 404) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3133) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2581) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|