House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 411) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3188) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from GVO/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2455) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVO/HMS, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|