House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 176, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 176, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 193-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 193-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Johanson, Wildberger, Costales, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Johanson, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Costales, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Misalucha Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1851-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 412) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3137) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2282) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|