Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022