House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 075, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 075, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 957).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Deferred One Day 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1685-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 418) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3140) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from LCA/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2527) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on LCA/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 10:31AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|