House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 419) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2820) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|