House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 424) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2734) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|