Senate | 03/02/2022 | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2257) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Referred to PSM, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |