Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2571) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |