Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Woodson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 493).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1810-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, Kapela, LoPresti, McKelvey, Tam, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Takayama; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Belatti, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Matayoshi, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from EDU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|