12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |