Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022