Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022