Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Act 029, 05/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Act 029, on 05/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 927).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 921).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-28-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-28-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator Keohokalole discharged as Chair. Senators Gabbard, Wakai, Kim discharged as Co-Chairs. Senator Fevella discharged as Conferee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Lowen, Tam Co-Chairs; Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Gabbard, Wakai, Kim Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 497).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1798-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Wildberger, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 3:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HHH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1368-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH/EEP on Tuesday, 03-22-22 11:15AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 444) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3189) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HTH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2566) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to HTH/AEN, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|