Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Act 023, 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Act 023, on 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 909).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Kidani.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 895).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-25-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-25-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator Inouye discharged as Chair. Senator Keith-Agaran discharged as Co-Chair. Senators Riviere, Fevella discharged as Conferees.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 875).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Riviere, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 689).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2008-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1046-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2716) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|