|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-24-21 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 10:00AM in conference room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|