Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Act 020, 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Act 020, on 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 876).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-19-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-19-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Deferred One Day 04-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 406).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1690-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, LoPresti, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-23-22 11:05AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3099) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2691) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-15-22 3:35PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to TRS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|