Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2573) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-15-22 3:35PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Referred to TRS, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |