Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 9, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022