Senate | 02/22/2022 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2640) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HTH, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |