Senate | 02/16/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |