Senate | 02/16/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2368) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |