House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 055, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 055, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 876).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-19-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-19-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 504).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1819-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1247-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-18-22 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 27) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-16-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Re-Referred to EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to EET, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|