Senate | 02/23/2022 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2213) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to HOU, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |