Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3284 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022