Senate | 02/17/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2462) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to LCA, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |