Senate | 02/15/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2334) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |